Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1954 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Standard Class 3 Tank |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
82020 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 29/09/1954 | 19/09/1965 | ||
82021 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 06/10/1954 | 17/10/1965 | ||
82022 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 15/10/1954 | 17/10/1965 | ||
82023 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 22/10/1954 | 02/10/1966 | ||
82024 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 29/10/1954 | 30/01/1966 | ||
82025 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 05/11/1954 | 09/08/1964 | ||
82026 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 12/11/1954 | 26/06/1966 | ||
82027 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 23/11/1954 | 09/01/1966 | ||
82028 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 02/12/1954 | 04/09/1966 | ||
82029 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 13/12/1954 | 09/07/1967 |