Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 40 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 858 Week
» 17809 Month
» 170762 Year
» 1836138 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/398
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1954
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Standard Class 3 Tank

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
82020   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 29/09/1954 19/09/1965  
82021   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 06/10/1954 17/10/1965  
82022   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 15/10/1954 17/10/1965  
82023   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 22/10/1954 02/10/1966  
82024   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 29/10/1954 30/01/1966  
82025   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 05/11/1954 09/08/1964  
82026   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 12/11/1954 26/06/1966  
82027   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 23/11/1954 09/01/1966  
82028   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 02/12/1954 04/09/1966  
82029   Standard Class 3 Tank BR Riddles 2-6-2T 13/12/1954 09/07/1967