Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1954 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Standard Class 3 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
77005 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 17/03/1954 | 29/11/1966 | ||
77006 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 23/03/1954 | 25/03/1966 | ||
77007 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 31/03/1954 | 29/11/1966 | ||
77008 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 23/04/1954 | 23/06/1966 | ||
77009 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 05/06/1954 | 12/05/1966 | ||
77015 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 29/07/1954 | 17/07/1966 | ||
77016 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 06/08/1954 | 03/03/1966 | ||
77017 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 20/08/1954 | 29/11/1966 | ||
77018 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 26/08/1954 | 29/11/1966 | ||
77019 | Standard Class 3 | BR | Riddles | 2-6-0 | 03/09/1954 | 29/11/1966 |