Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1883 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1813 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1834 | 926 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 03/1883 | 08/1929 | |
1835 | 927 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 03/1883 | 31/01/1949 | |
1836 | 928 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 03/1883 | 03/1939 | |
1837 | 929 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 03/1883 | 18/08/1934 | |
1838 | 930 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 04/1883 | 28/05/1947 | |
1839 | 931 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 04/1883 | 09/1938 | |
1840 | 932 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 04/1883 | 03/1937 | |
1841 | 933 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 04/1883 | 12/1934 | |
1842 | 934 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 05/1883 | 05/1928 | |
1843 | 935 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 05/1883 | 07/1929 | |
1844 | 936 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 05/1883 | 12/1935 | |
1845 | 937 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 06/1883 | 08/1930 | |
1846 | 938 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 09/1883 | 29/07/1946 | |
1847 | 939 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 10/1883 | 13/05/1947 | |
1848 | 940 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 10/1883 | 06/1935 | |
1849 | 941 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 11/1883 | 24/08/1934 | |
1850 | 942 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 11/1883 | 09/1938 | |
1851 | 943 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 12/1883 | 09/1931 | |
1852 | 944 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 12/1883 | 04/1929 | |
1853 | 945 | 1813 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 01/1884 | 12/1934 |