Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1883 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2301 | 946 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1883 | 05/01/1934 | |
2302 | 947 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1883 | 03/1931 | |
2303 | 948 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1883 | 02/1935 | |
2304 | 949 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 06/1883 | 01/1929 | |
2305 | 950 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 07/1883 | 06/1935 | |
2306 | 951 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 07/1883 | 04/1929 | |
2307 | 952 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 07/1883 | 04/1932 | |
2308 | 953 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1883 | 21/04/1921 | |
2309 | 954 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1883 | 04/1931 | |
2310 | 955 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1883 | 17/11/1934 | |
2311 | 956 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 08/1883 | 16/11/1934 | |
2312 | 957 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1883 | 02/1931 | |
2313 | 958 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1883 | 12/1938 | |
2314 | 959 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1883 | 05/1932 | |
2315 | 960 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1883 | 14/11/1945 | |
2316 | 961 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1883 | 16/11/1934 | |
2317 | 962 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1883 | 17/11/1934 | |
2318 | 963 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1883 | 08/1929 | |
2319 | 964 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1883 | 02/1931 | |
2320 | 965 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1883 | 24/11/1944 |