Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1885 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 2361 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2361 | 1032 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 09/1885 | 05/1932 | |
2362 | 1033 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1885 | 07/11/1946 | |
2363 | 1034 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1885 | 10/1932 | |
2364 | 1035 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1885 | 04/08/1934 | |
2365 | 1036 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1885 | 10/1928 | |
2366 | 1037 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1885 | 01/02/1933 | |
2367 | 1038 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1885 | 05/1932 | |
2368 | 1039 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1885 | 03/1938 | |
2369 | 1040 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1885 | 11/1937 | |
2370 | 1041 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1885 | 03/1935 | |
2371 | 1042 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1886 | 03/1930 | |
2372 | 1043 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1886 | 02/1938 | |
2373 | 1044 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1886 | 03/11/1934 | |
2374 | 1045 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1886 | 11/1930 | |
2375 | 1046 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1886 | 05/1938 | |
2376 | 1047 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1886 | 12/1938 | |
2377 | 1048 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1886 | 02/1931 | |
2378 | 1049 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1886 | 17/03/1945 | |
2379 | 1050 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1886 | 02/1931 | |
2380 | 1051 | 2361 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 05/1886 | 23/09/1943 |