Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1891 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2401 | 1271 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 09/01/1953 | |
2402 | 1272 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2403 | 1273 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2404 | 1274 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2405 | 1275 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2406 | 1276 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 03/11/1945 | |
2407 | 1277 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 21/01/1952 | |
2408 | 1278 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 12/01/1953 | |
2409 | 1279 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 22/04/1953 | |
2410 | 1280 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2411 | 1281 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 14/04/1954 | |
2412 | 1282 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2413 | 1283 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2414 | 1284 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 23/03/1953 | |
2415 | 1285 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 12/1940 | |
2416 | 1286 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2417 | 1287 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 02/1939 | |
2418 | 1288 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2419 | 1289 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 10/1940 | |
2420 | 1290 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 21/04/1921 | |
2421 | 1291 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 05/1938 | |
2422 | 1292 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1892 | 10/1940 | |
2423 | 1293 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1892 | 12/1940 | |
2424 | 1294 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1892 | 22/07/1946 | |
2425 | 1295 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1892 | 12/1940 | |
2426 | 1296 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 14/12/1953 | |
2427 | 1297 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 10/1940 | |
2428 | 1298 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 10/1940 | |
2429 | 1299 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1892 | 10/1940 | |
2430 | 1300 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 03/1892 | 10/1940 |