Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1892 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1854 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1721 | 1301 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1892 | 26/07/1946 | |
1722 | 1302 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1892 | 07/11/1946 | |
1723 | 1303 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1892 | 01/1935 | |
1724 | 1304 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1892 | 11/1929 | |
1725 | 1305 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1892 | 03/10/1946 | |
1726 | 1306 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1892 | 24/04/1948 | |
1727 | 1307 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1892 | 05/1935 | |
1728 | 1308 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1892 | 02/1932 | |
1729 | 1309 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1892 | 09/1942 | |
1730 | 1310 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1892 | 02/08/1948 | |
1731 | 1311 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1892 | 14/06/1949 | |
1732 | 1312 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1892 | 15/07/1946 | |
1733 | 1313 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1892 | 06/1936 | |
1734 | 1314 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1892 | 23/02/1946 | |
1735 | 1315 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1892 | 15/07/1946 | |
1736 | 1316 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1892 | 27/04/1945 | |
1737 | 1317 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1892 | 03/11/1945 | |
1738 | 1318 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 09/1892 | 02/1939 | |
1739 | 1319 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 09/1892 | 03/1931 | |
1740 | 1320 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 09/1892 | 08/11/1944 |