Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1895 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 1854 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
905 | 1433 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1895 | 15/11/1947 | |
906 | 1434 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1895 | 24/04/1948 | |
907 | 1435 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1895 | 13/03/1951 | |
1791 | 1436 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1895 | 01/1935 | |
1792 | 1437 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1895 | 03/11/1945 | |
1793 | 1438 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 05/1895 | 14/11/1945 | |
1794 | 1439 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1895 | 04/12/1946 | |
1795 | 1440 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1895 | 26/06/1947 | |
1796 | 1441 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1895 | 11/02/1947 | |
1797 | 1442 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1895 | 31/07/1946 | |
1798 | 1443 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1895 | 15/07/1946 | |
1799 | 1444 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 06/1895 | 20/12/1949 | |
1800 | 1445 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1895 | 11/12/1947 | |
1894 | 1446 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1895 | 15/02/1949 | |
1895 | 1447 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1895 | 22/05/1947 | |
1896 | 1448 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1895 | 15/12/1949 | |
1897 | 1449 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1895 | 03/01/1949 | |
1898 | 1450 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 07/1895 | 27/04/1945 | |
1899 | 1451 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1895 | 20/01/1945 | |
1900 | 1452 | 1854 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0PT | 08/1895 | 24/04/1948 |