Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 1934 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Administration | Crewe Works order #119 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5020 | 4565 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1934 | 11/12/1965 | |
5021 | 4566 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1934 | 16/09/1967 | |
5022 | 4567 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1934 | 16/09/1963 | |
5023 | 4568 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1934 | 16/09/1963 | |
5024 | 4569 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1934 | 13/05/1967 | |
5025 | 4570 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 08/1934 | 10/08/1968 | |
5026 | 4571 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 09/10/1965 | |
5027 | 4572 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 04/05/1968 | |
5028 | 4573 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 25/03/1967 | |
5029 | 4574 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 19/10/1966 | |
5030 | 4575 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 29/12/1962 | |
5031 | 4576 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 06/1967 | |
5032 | 4577 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 08/02/1964 | |
5033 | 4578 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 24/12/1966 | |
5034 | 4579 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 03/02/1968 | |
5035 | 4580 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 21/11/1964 | |
5036 | 4581 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 29/12/1962 | |
5037 | 4582 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 27/11/1965 | |
5038 | 4583 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 09/1934 | 17/02/1968 | |
5039 | 4584 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1934 | 26/08/1967 | |
5040 | 4585 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 22/07/1967 | |
5041 | 4586 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 09/12/1967 | |
5042 | 4587 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 16/09/1967 | |
5043 | 4588 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 25/11/1967 | |
5044 | 4589 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 10/1966 | |
5045 | 4590 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 29/10/1966 | |
5046 | 4591 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 22/06/1968 | |
5047 | 4592 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 17/07/1966 | |
5048 | 4593 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 10/1935 | 11/1967 | |
5049 | 4594 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 29/08/1963 | |
5050 | 4595 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 12/08/1967 | |
5051 | 4596 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 19/11/1966 | |
5052 | 4597 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 30/09/1967 | |
5053 | 4598 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 19/11/1966 | |
5054 | 4599 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 10/02/1968 | |
5055 | 4600 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
5056 | 4601 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 11/1935 | 19/08/1967 | |
5057 | 4602 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 12/08/1967 | |
5058 | 4603 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 08/10/1966 | |
5059 | 4604 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 08/07/1967 | |
5060 | 4605 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 04/03/1967 | |
5061 | 4606 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 18/11/1967 | |
5062 | 4607 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 15/04/1967 | |
5063 | 4608 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 10/10/1966 | |
5064 | 4609 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 11/03/1967 | |
5065 | 4610 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 12/1935 | 05/1968 | |
5066 | 4611 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1935 | 06/02/1964 | |
5067 | 4612 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1935 | 21/10/1967 | |
5068 | 4613 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1935 | 12/1965 | |
5069 | 4614 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 01/1935 | 24/06/1967 |