Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 1910 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | O4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 2529 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 07/1910 | 28/05/1951 | |
2 | 2530 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 07/1910 | 31/05/1954 | |
8 | 2531 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 08/1910 | 25/08/1950 | |
17 | 2532 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 08/1910 | 14/03/1949 | |
35 | 2533 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 08/1910 | 03/11/1952 | |
36 | 2534 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 08/1910 | 04/06/1951 | |
46 | 2535 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 09/1910 | 10/03/1950 | |
108 | 2536 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 09/1910 | 07/01/1952 | |
109 | 2537 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 09/1910 | 26/07/1955 | |
110 | 2538 | O4 | TVR | Hurry Riches | 0-6-2T | 09/1910 | 12/07/1954 |