Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4454 Week
» 4454 Month
» 71316 Year
» 1736692 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry



Order Details for Lot No: VF/VF978
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Date 1904
For 15 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
235 1927 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1904 21/12/1956  
236 1928 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1904 25/01/1954  
237 1929 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1904 28/05/1960  
238 1930 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1904 27/10/1955  
239 1931 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1904 20/06/1955  
242 1932 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 30/01/1961  
243 1933 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 07/10/1957  
244 1934 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 23/09/1962  
245 1935 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 11/07/1955  
246 1936 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 15/09/1962  
247 1937 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 09/11/1959  
248 1938 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 20/07/1962  
249 1939 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1904 03/12/1956  
250 1940 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1904 23/09/1962  
252 1941 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1904 06/08/1956