Manufacturer: Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
Builder | Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Date | 1892 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | 655 |
Built For | GWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1771 | 575 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 12/1892 | 01/1937 | |
1772 | 576 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 12/1892 | 03/1929 | |
1773 | 577 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 01/1893 | 16/03/1950 | |
1774 | 578 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 02/1893 | 10/1932 | |
1775 | 579 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 02/1893 | 10/1938 | |
1776 | 580 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 03/1893 | 06/1938 | |
1777 | 581 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 03/1893 | 07/1941 | |
1778 | 582 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 04/1893 | 10/1928 | |
1779 | 583 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 05/1893 | 13/01/1945 | |
1780 | 584 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 05/1893 | 02/08/1948 | |
1781 | 585 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 06/1893 | 04/1929 | |
1782 | 586 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 08/1893 | 03/11/1950 | |
1783 | 587 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 09/1893 | 01/1940 | |
1784 | 588 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 10/1893 | 10/02/1945 | |
1785 | 589 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 10/1893 | 02/09/1946 | |
1786 | 590 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 11/1893 | 03/11/1945 | |
1787 | 591 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 11/1893 | 04/01/1947 | |
1788 | 592 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 02/1894 | 03/11/1945 | |
1789 | 593 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 05/1894 | 18/10/1950 | |
1790 | 594 | 655 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0ST | 06/1894 | 24/06/1946 |