Manufacturer: Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
Builder | Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Date | 1871 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | 633 |
Built For | GWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
633 | 167 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 11/1871 | 31/10/1933 | |
634 | 168 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 11/1871 | 05/03/1934 | |
635 | 169 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 12/1871 | 08/1928 | |
636 | 170 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 12/1871 | 10/03/1933 | |
637 | 171 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 12/1871 | 30/06/1934 | |
638 | 172 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 01/1872 | 09/1930 | |
639 | 173 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 01/1872 | 17/03/1934 | |
640 | 174 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 02/1872 | 24/05/1934 | |
641 | 175 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 02/1872 | 04/11/1933 | |
642 | 176 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 03/1872 | 17/03/1934 | |
643 | 177 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 03/1872 | 21/02/1934 | |
644 | 178 | 633 | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0T | 04/1872 | 04/1932 |