Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4459 Week
» 4459 Month
» 71321 Year
» 1736697 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Yorkshire Engine Company



Order Details for Lot No: YE/YE981
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Date 1906
For 5 Steam locomotives
Class J11

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1115 854 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1906 17/01/1955  
1116 855 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 06/1906 02/12/1958  
1117 856 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 07/1906 26/06/1962  
1118 857 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1906 24/08/1962  
1119 858 J11 GCR Robinson 0-6-0 08/1906 31/01/1962