List of Depots
Depot | Codes | From | Date Opened | Closed to Steam | Date Closed | Original Company | Big Four Company | BR Region | Map | Web |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aberbeeg | 16 ABEEG 86H 86F |
1875 01/01/1919 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 |
07/04/1919 | 12/1964 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Abercynon | 18 AYN 88E |
1875 01/01/1929 01/02/1950 |
02/11/1964 | GWR | WR | Map | ||||
Aberdare | 26 ABDR 86J 88J |
1875 01/01/1908 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 |
1867 | 01/03/1965 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Aberdeen Ferryhill | 29B ABD 61B AB |
1875 1925 01/02/1949 06/05/1973 |
18/03/1967 | 06/12/1987 | Map | |||||
Abergavenny | 4D 86K |
01/01/1935 01/02/1950 |
1867 | 22/11/1954 | 04/01/1958 | LNWR | LMS | WR | Map | |
Accrington | 24A 10E |
1875 06/03/1961 |
06/03/1961 | Map | ||||||
Agecroft | 26B 9J |
1875 01/09/1963 |
1889 | 17/10/1966 | LYR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Aintree | 23B 27B 8L |
1875 01/06/1950 01/09/1963 |
12/06/1967 | Map | ||||||
Alexandra Dock (Hull) | Hls 53c |
20/07/1885 01/02/1950 |
20/07/1885 | 14/11/1960 | HBR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Allerton | 8H 8J AN |
01/07/1960 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Alnmouth | Twd 52d |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1875 | 19/06/1966 | Map | |||||
Alsager | 5E | 1875 | 18/06/1962 | Map | ||||||
Alston | Bla 52c |
1875 01/02/1950 |
17/11/1852 | 27/09/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Andover Junction (MSWJR) | Sdn 82c |
01/05/1882 01/02/1950 |
01/05/1882 | 1958 | SMAR | GWR | Map | |||
Annesley | ANN 38B 16D 16B |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 01/09/1963 |
1898 | 14/01/1966 | GCR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Annfield Plain | AFP | 1875 | 01/01/1886 | 09/09/1940 | NER | LNER | Map | |||
Anstruther | Thj | 01/09/1883 | 01/09/1883 | 12/1960 | NBR | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Ardrossan | 30C 67D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
15/02/1965 | Map | ||||||
Ardsley | ARD 37A 56B |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1956 |
Map | |||||||
Ascot | - | 04/06/1856 | 04/06/1856 | 1937 | LSWR | SR | Map | |||
Ashford | AFD 74A 73F AF |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 06/05/1973 |
SR | SR | Map | |||||
Aston | 3D 21D 2J |
1875 01/06/1960 01/09/1963 |
11/10/1965 | Map | ||||||
Aviemore | 32B 60B |
1875 01/01/1949 |
Map | |||||||
Aylesbury | 11 | 1875 | 01/10/1863 | 16/06/1962 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Ayr | 30D 67C AY |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
05/08/1839 | 03/10/1966 | GSWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Bacup | 26E | 1875 | Map | |||||||
Balloch | Efd 65I |
15/07/1850 01/02/1950 |
15/07/1850 | 30/09/1961 | CDR | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Banbury | 44 BAN 84C 2D |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
02/09/1850 | 03/10/1966 | GWR | GWR | LMR | Map | ||
Bangor | 7B 6H |
1875 01/03/1952 |
14/06/1965 | Map | ||||||
Bank Hall | 23A 27A 8K |
1875 01/06/1950 01/09/1963 |
1850 | 17/10/1966 | LYR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Barnard Castle | Dar | 1875 | 1865 | 03/05/1937 | NER | LNER | Map | |||
Barnsley | BRN 36D 41G |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Barnstaple Junction | BPL 72E 83F |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Barrow in Furness | 11B 11A 12E 12C BW |
1875 20/04/1958 01/06/1960 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1874 | 12/12/1966 | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Barry | ?? BRY 28 88C |
11/1888 01/01/1922 01/01/1922 01/01/1950 |
1890 | 09/1964 | BaR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Basingstoke | BAS 70D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Basingstoke (GWR) | 31 | 1875 | 01/11/1848 | 11/1950 | BHR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Bath Green Park (S&D) | 8B 8a M8B 22C 71G 82F |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/03/1948 01/02/1958 |
04/08/1869 | 07/03/1966 | MR | LMS | WR | Map | ||
Bathgate | BGT 64F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Beattock | 12F 68D 66F BP |
1875 01/01/1949 01/07/1962 06/05/1973 |
01/05/1967 | Map | ||||||
Bedford | 14 M14 15D 14E 14C BE |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 20/04/1958 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
08/1963 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Belle Vue | 21 M21 19E 13B 26G 26F |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/01/1950 01/05/1950 01/10/1955 |
1870 | 16/04/1956 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Bescot | 3A 21B 2F BS |
01/01/1935 01/04/1960 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1892 | 28/03/1966 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Bidston | BID 6F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1897 | 11/02/1963 | Map | |||||
Birkenhead Central | BK | |||||||||
Birkenhead Mollington Street | BHD 24 6C 8H BC |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1878 | 06/11/1967 | 24/11/1985 | Map | ||||
Birmingham Division | D02 | 18/04/1966 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Bishops Stortford | 30C | 01/02/1950 | Map | |||||||
Blackpool Central | 24E 28A 24E 10B |
1875 01/06/1950 01/04/1952 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Blair Atholl | 29a 63a |
08/1868 01/02/1950 |
08/1868 | 1962 | HR | LMS | ScR | Map | ||
Blaydon | BLA 52C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Bletchley | 2B 4A 1E BY |
1875 01/07/1950 01/03/1952 06/05/1973 |
05/07/1965 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Blyth (North) | NBH 52F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1897 | 09/09/1967 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Blyth (South) | SBH | 1875 | 1880 | 28/05/1967 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Blyth Cambois | BL | 06/05/1973 | 1968 | 17/09/1994 | ER | Map | ||||
Bolton | 26C 9K |
1875 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Bordon | GFDs | 1875 | LSWR | SR | SR | Map | ||||
Borough Gardens | BOR 54C 52J |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Boston | BOS 40F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Bounds Green | BN | 1980 | Map | |||||||
Bourne | 10B M10B 15c |
16/05/1860 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
16/05/1860 | 1953 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Bournemouth | BM 71B 70F BM |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
06/03/1888 | 09/07/1967 | LSWR | SR | SR | Map | ||
Bournville | 3B 3a M3B 21B |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
1895 | 14/02/1960 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Bradford Hammerton Street | BFD 37C 56G 55F HS |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1956 01/12/1967 01/03/1975 |
03/1883 | 1958 | 1994 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | |
Brecon | 5 M5 4c 89B 88K |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 |
01/05/1863 | 31/12/1962 | BMR | LMS | WR | Map | ||
Bricklayers Arms | BA 73B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Bridlington | BRI 53D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Brighton | BTN 75A BI |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Bristol Barrow Road | 8 M8 22A 82E |
1873 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1958 |
1873 | 20/11/1965 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Bristol Bath Road | BRD 22 82A BR |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
1934 | 12/09/1960 | 28/08/1995 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | |
Bromsgrove | 21C 85F 85D |
1875 01/02/1958 10/09/1960 |
24/06/1840 | 27/09/1964 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Brunswick | LIV 8E 27F |
1875 01/05/1950 20/04/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Bullcroft Junction | BUL | 20/07/1885 | 20/07/1885 | 05/12/1931 | HBR | LNER | Map | |||
Burntisland | Thj | 20/09/1847 | 20/09/1847 | 1933 | ENR | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Burton | 2 M2 17B 16F BU |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 09/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1840 | 09/1966 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Bury | 26D 9M BV BQ |
1875 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 05/01/1975 |
12/04/1965 | Map | ||||||
Bury St Edmunds | BSE 31E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1904 | 05/01/1959 | GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Bushbury | 13 W13 3B 21C 2K |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/06/1960 01/09/1963 |
1859 | 12/04/1965 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Buxton (LNWR) | 9D 9L BX |
1875 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1892 | 04/03/1968 | LNWR | LMS | MR | Map | ||
Buxton (MR) | 20 M20 |
1875 01/01/1923 |
1867 | 19/08/1935 | MR | LMS | Map | |||
Cambridge | CAM 31A CA |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
18/06/1962 | GER | LNER | ER | Map | |||
Camden | 1 W1 1B |
1863 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
20/06/1837 | 09/09/1963 | 03/01/1966 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | |
Canklow | 19C 41D |
1875 01/02/1958 |
11/10/1965 | LMS | LMR | Map | ||||
Cardiff Canton | 66 CDF 86C 88A 86A CF |
1875 01/01/1882 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1882 | 09/1962 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Cardiff Cathays | 58 CHYS 88A 88M |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/03/1962 |
Map | |||||||
Cardiff East Dock | 48 CED 88B CED 88L 88A |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1960 01/03/1962 01/09/1963 |
02/08/1965 | Map | ||||||
Carlisle Canal | CAR 12B 68E 12D 12C |
1875 01/06/1950 07/10/1951 01/02/1958 20/04/1958 |
17/06/1963 | Map | ||||||
Carlisle Kingmoor | 12A 68A 12A KM KD |
1875 10/06/1950 01/02/1958 06/05/1973 05/01/1975 |
31/12/1967 | Map | ||||||
Carlisle New Yard | KD KM |
05/01/1975 |
||||||||
Carlisle Upperby | 12B 12A 12B |
1875 10/06/1950 01/02/1958 |
12/12/1966 | Map | ||||||
Carmarthen | 37 CARM 87G |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Carnforth | 11A 24L 10A |
1875 20/04/1958 01/09/1963 |
05/08/1968 | Map | ||||||
Carstairs | 28C 64D 66E |
1875 01/01/1949 01/05/1960 |
02/02/1967 | Map | ||||||
Cheltenham High Street | ? | 1893 | 1911 | 28/12/1935 | MSWJR | GWR | Map | |||
Cheltenham Malvern Road | 45 CHEL |
1875 1875 |
1907 | 10/1963 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Chester (Midland) | 6A | 01/01/1935 | 1870 | 05/06/1967 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Chester Northgate | CHRN 6D |
1875 01/01/1950 |
02/11/1874 | 01/1960 | CLC | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Chester West | CHR 54 84K 6E CH |
01/01/1835 1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 06/05/1973 |
1856 | 04/1960 | CBR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Chippenham | Sdn 132s 82c |
1858 1858 01/02/1950 |
1858 | 02/03/1964 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Coalville | 10C 10b M10C 17C 15D 15E |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 20/04/1958 09/09/1963 |
1890 | 04/10/1965 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Colchester | COL 30E CR |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Colwick | CLK 38A 40E 16B |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1958 03/01/1966 |
12/12/1966 | Map | ||||||
Consett | CON 54D 52K |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
24/05/1965 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | |||
Copley Hill (Leeds) | COP 37B 56C |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1956 |
1900 | 07/09/1964 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Corkerhill | 30A 67A CK |
1875 01/01/1949 06/05/1973 |
01/05/1967 | Map | ||||||
Cornbrook Junction | 21C | 01/01/1880 | 01/01/1880 | 03/1895 | MSLR | Map | ||||
Coventry | 2F 2D |
1875 01/07/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Crewe Diesel | 5A CE CD |
25/05/1965 06/05/1973 03/12/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Crewe Electric | CE | 03/12/1973 | Map | |||||||
Crewe North | 5A | 1875 | 25/05/1965 | Map | ||||||
Crewe South | 5B | 1875 | 06/11/1967 | Map | ||||||
Crewe Works | 99C | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
Cricklewood East | 15 M15 14A CD CW |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 06/05/1973 06/12/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Cricklewood West | 14B | 01/09/1963 | 1882 | 14/12/1964 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Croes Newydd | 64 CNYD 84J 89B 6C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 01/09/1963 |
05/06/1967 | Map | ||||||
Cudworth | CUD 53E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
20/07/1885 | 30/07/1951 | Map | |||||
Dalry Road | 28B 64C |
01/01/1940 01/02/1950 |
03/10/1965 | Map | ||||||
Danygraig | 47 DG 87C DG 87C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/01/1961 01/03/1962 |
Map | |||||||
Darlington (Bank Top) | DAR 51A DN |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Darlington (North Road) | Dar 51a |
1935 01/02/1950 |
1935 | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Dawsholm | 31E 65D |
1875 01/01/1949 |
05/10/1964 | Map | ||||||
Derby | 1 M1 17A 16C DY |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 09/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1890 | 03/1967 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Derby Works | ZE | 06/05/1973 | LMR | |||||||
Devons Road (Bow) | 13B 1D 1J |
1882 10/06/1950 09/09/1963 |
1882 | 25/08/1958 | 10/02/1964 | NLR | LMS | LMR | Map | |
Didcot | 41 DID 81E |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
GWR | WR | Map | |||||
Doncaster | DON 36A DR |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Dorchester | DOR 71C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Dover | DOV 74C 73H |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Duffryn Yard | DYD 57 87B |
1875 1875 01/01/1950 |
02/03/1964 | Map | ||||||
Dumfries | 12G 68B 67E |
1878 01/01/1949 01/07/1962 |
1878 | 01/05/1966 | GSWR | LMS | SCR | Map | ||
Dundee Tay Bridge | DEE 62B |
01/01/1878 01/01/1949 |
01/01/1878 | 01/05/1967 | NBR | LNER | ScR | Map | ||
Dundee West | 29C 62b 62B DE |
01/01/1935 01/02/1950 01/04/1967 06/05/1973 |
1885 | 1958 | 1982 | CR | LMS | SCR | Map | |
Dunfermline Townhill | 62C DT |
01/07/1970 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Dunfermline Upper | DFU 62C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Duns | Twd Stm |
1924 1948 |
15/08/1849 | 19/12/1949 | NBR | LNER | NER | Map | ||
Durham | Sun 54a 52g |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
1864 | 08/12/1958 | NER | LNER | NER | Map | ||
Durran Hill (Carlisle) | 33 M33 12C |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
02/08/1875 | 15/02/1936 | 02/11/1959 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | |
East Hartlepool | EHL | 1875 | 17/04/1939 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | |||
East Kent Railway | EKR | 1875 | ||||||||
Eastbourne | EBN 75G |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Eastfield | EFD 65A ED |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
09/1904 | 11/1966 | 1992 | NBL | LNER | ScR | Map | |
Eastleigh | ELH 71A 70D EH |
1875 01/02/1950 28/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Eastleigh Works | ? | 1875 | LSWR | SR | SR | |||||
Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 76 NPT 86A 86B EJ |
1875 01/07/1915 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
07/1915 | 10/1965 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Edge Hill | 8A EG |
1875 06/05/1973 |
06/05/1968 | Map | ||||||
Exeter | 53 EXE 83C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Exeter Queen Street | - | 19/07/1860 | 19/07/1860 | 1887 | LSWR | Map | ||||
Exmouth Junction | EXJ 72A 83D |
1875 01/02/1950 09/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Farnley Junction | 25G 55C |
1875 01/09/1956 |
Map | |||||||
Faversham | FAV 73E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
27/01/1964 | Map | ||||||
Feltham | FEL 70B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
22/07/1970 | Map | ||||||
Ferndale | 88 FDL |
1875 1875 |
1866 | 09/1964 | Map | |||||
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) | FER | 1875 | 1881 | 07/11/1938 | NER | LNER | Map | |||
Finsbury Park | 34G FP |
15/04/1960 06/05/1973 |
||||||||
Fishguard Goodwick | 77 FGD 87J |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Fleetwood | 24F 28B 24F 10C |
1875 01/02/1950 01/04/1952 01/09/1963 |
1883 | 14/02/1966 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Folkestone Junction | FOL | 1875 | 18/12/1843 | 12/06/1961 | SER | SR | SR | Map | ||
Forfar | 29D 63C 63a |
18/12/1899 01/02/1950 01/11/1959 |
18/12/1899 | 18/07/1964 | CR | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Forres | 32C 60E |
1875 01/01/1949 |
Map | |||||||
Fort William | FW 63D 65J 63B 65H FW |
1875 01/02/1950 01/05/1955 01/06/1960 01/07/1970 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Fratton | FRA 71D 70F FR |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1954 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Frodingham | FRO 36C FH |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Gateshead | GHD 52A GD |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Gillingham (Kent) | GIL 73D GI |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Glasgow Shields Road | GS GW |
01/01/1970 01/03/1975 |
||||||||
Gloucester Barnwood | 7 M7 22B 85E 85C |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1958 10/09/1960 |
08/07/1850 | 04/05/1964 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Gloucester Horton Road | 85 GLO 85B GL |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GWR | WR | Map | |||||
Goole | 25C 53E 50D GO |
1875 01/09/1956 01/01/1960 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Gorton | GOR 39A 9H 9G |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 20/04/1958 |
14/06/1965 | Map | ||||||
Grangemouth | 31D 65F GM |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
CR | LMS | SCR | Map | ||||
Grantham | GRA 35B 34F |
1875 01/02/1950 01/03/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Greenock Ladyburn | 27B 66D |
1884 01/01/1949 |
1884 | 26/11/1966 | CR | LMS | SCR | Map | ||
Grimsby | GRI | 1888 | 1888 | 1920 | GCR | Map | ||||
Guildford | GFD 70C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
09/07/1967 | Map | ||||||
Hamilton (West) | 27C 66C HN |
1884 01/01/1949 06/05/1973 |
1884 | 07/1962 | 07/1982 | CR | LMS | SCR | Map | |
Hampton Court | - | 01/02/1849 | 01/02/1849 | 18/06/1916 | LSWR | Map | ||||
Hasland | 23 M23 18C 16H |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 |
1875 | 07/09/1964 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Hatfield | HAT 34C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
14/01/1961 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | |||
Haverton Hill | HAV 51G |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1899 | 13/06/1959 | Map | |||||
Hawick | HAW 64G |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Haymarket | HAY 64B HA |
1875 01/02/1949 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Healey Mills | 56B HM 55C |
01/09/1966 01/09/1966 01/12/1967 |
||||||||
Heaton | HTN 52B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
31/08/1875 | 17/06/1963 | Map | |||||
Heaton Mersey | STP 21HM 21b M21HM 19D 13C 9F 17E 9F |
1875 1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1950 22/05/1950 01/01/1957 20/04/1958 |
01/1889 | 06/05/1968 | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Helensburgh | Pkd 65H |
11/08/1894 01/02/1950 |
11/08/1894 | 30/09/1961 | NBR | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Hellifield | 20G 23B 20G 24H |
1875 01/06/1950 07/10/1951 01/02/1957 |
17/06/1963 | Map | ||||||
Helmsdale | 32a 60C |
19/06/1871 01/01/1949 |
19/06/1871 | 07/1961 | HR | LMS | SCR | Map | ||
Hereford | 95 HFD 85C 86C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 |
Map | |||||||
Hertford East | 30B | 01/02/1950 | Map | |||||||
Hexham | Bla 52c |
1869 01/02/1950 |
1869 | 06/04/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Highbridge | 71J | 01/02/1951 | 1862 | 11/05/1959 | Map | |||||
Hitchin (GNR) | HIT 34D HI |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
07/08/1850 | 06/1961 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Hitchin (MR) | 14H 14a |
1875 01/01/1911 |
08/05/1857 | 1920 | MR | Map | ||||
Hither Green | HIT 73C HG |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Holbeck (MR) | 28 M28 20A 55A HO |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1957 06/05/1973 |
09/05/1868 | 02/10/1967 | MR | LMS | ER | Map | ||
Holyhead | 7C 6J HD |
1875 01/03/1952 06/05/1973 |
01/08/1848 | 05/12/1966 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Hornsey | HSY 34B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Horsham | HOR 75D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Horwich Works | 99H | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
Hounslow | - | 01/02/1850 | 01/02/1850 | 1894 | LSWR | Map | ||||
Huddersfield | 25B 55G |
1875 01/02/1957 |
Map | |||||||
Hull Botanic Gardens | HLB 53B 50C BG |
1875 01/02/1950 01/01/1960 06/05/1973 |
1901 | 13/06/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Hull Dairycoates | HLD 53A 50B |
1875 01/02/1950 01/01/1960 |
1863 | 24/06/1967 | 21/09/1970 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | |
Hull Springhead | HLS 53C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
20/07/1885 | 15/12/1958 | 07/1961 | HBR | LNER | ER | Map | |
Hurlford | 30B 67B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Hyndland | HY | 01/01/1970 | ||||||||
Ilford | 30a | 01/02/1950 | 1901 | 05/1939 | GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Ilkley | 29I 29b M29I 20e 55f |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/01/1957 |
1892 | 05/01/1959 | LMR | Map | ||||
Immingham | IMM 40B IM |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
LNER | ER | Map | |||||
Inverness | 32A 60A IS |
1875 01/01/1949 06/05/1973 |
HR | LMS | SCR | Map | ||||
Ipswich | IPS 32B IP |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Keadby | KEA | 10/09/1859 | 10/09/1859 | 12/06/1932 | SYR | LNER | Map | |||
Keith | KEI 61C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Kent and East Sussex Railway | KESR | 1875 | ||||||||
Kentish Town | 16 M16 14B |
1875 01/01/1923 1935 |
08/09/1867 | 04/1963 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Kettering | 12 M12 15B 15C |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 |
1866 | 14/06/1965 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Kidderminster | 125 KDR 85D 84G 2P |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Kings Cross | KX 34A KX |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Kings Lynn | KL 31C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Kingston upon Thames | - | 01/07/1863 | 01/07/1863 | 1907 | LSWR | Map | ||||
Kipps | KPS 65E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Kirkby in Ashfield | 16C 16B 16E |
1875 01/10/1955 01/09/1963 |
1890 | 03/10/1966 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Kirkby Stephen | KBY 51H 12E 12D |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 20/04/1958 |
07/08/1861 | 20/11/1961 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Kittybrewster | KIT 61A |
1875 01/01/1949 |
14/08/1967 | Map | ||||||
Knottingley | 56A 55G KY |
01/07/1967 01/12/1967 06/05/1973 |
ER | Map | ||||||
Ladybank | Thj | 1875 | 1958 | NBR | LNER | SCR | Map | |||
Laira | LA 83 83D 84A LA |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Lancaster Green Ayre | 32 M32 11C 20H 23C 11E 24J 10J |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/01/1945 01/06/1950 07/10/1951 01/02/1957 01/09/1963 |
17/11/1849 | 18/04/1966 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Landore | LDR 87 87E 87A LE |
1875 1875 01/01/1950 14/11/1969 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Langwith Junction | LNG 40E 41J |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1958 |
16/11/1896 | 06/02/1966 | LDECR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Largs | 67D | 01/09/1969 | GSWR | LMS | Map | |||||
Leamington | 94 LMTN 84D 2L |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
14/06/1965 | Map | ||||||
Lees (Oldham) | 26F 26E 9P |
1875 01/10/1955 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Leicester (G.C.) | LEI 38C 15E 15D |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 01/09/1963 |
1897 | 06/07/1964 | GCR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Leicester Division | D15 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Leicester Midland | 10 M10 15C 15A LR |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
05/07/1840 | 13/06/1965 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Leith Central | 64H | 01/11/1958 | ||||||||
Lincoln | LIN 40A LN |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
1875 | 10/1964 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Line Power Controller, Derby | ML | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | LMR | ||||||
Liverpool Division | D08 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Llandudno Junction | 38 W38 7A 6G LJ |
04/1899 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/03/1952 01/01/1987 |
01/10/1858 | 03/10/1966 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Llanelly | 107 LLY 87F |
1875 1875 01/01/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Llantrisant | LTS 86 86D 88G |
01/10/1864 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 |
08/1860 | 10/1964 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
LNWR Western Division | WD | 1850 | 1850 | 31/12/1947 | LNWR | LMS | ||||
Loch Tay | Stg 31b 63b 65j |
13/03/1886 13/03/1886 01/02/1950 01/06/1960 |
13/03/1886 | 27/09/1965 | CR | LMS | ScR | Map | ||
London (Midland) | D14 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
London Division | D01 | 18/04/1966 | ||||||||
London Midland - Western Lines | LMW ACL |
01/01/1960 01/01/1970 |
||||||||
London Transport Passenger Board | ? | 1900 | ||||||||
London, Tilbury and Southend Railway | LTS | 1875 | 1875 | 31/12/1947 | ||||||
Longsight | 16 W16 9A LO |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 06/05/1973 |
14/02/1965 | Map | ||||||
Longsight (Electric) | LG | 06/05/1973 | LMR | Map | ||||||
Lostock Hall | 24C 10D LH |
1875 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
05/08/1968 | Map | ||||||
Louth | LTH 40C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
LNER | ER | Map | |||||
Low Moor | 25F 56F 55J |
1875 01/09/1956 01/08/1967 |
LYR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||||
Lower Darwen | 24D 10H |
1875 01/09/1963 |
14/02/1966 | Map | ||||||
Lower Ince | 13G 10F |
1875 01/05/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Lowestoft | LOW 32C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Lowestoft Engineers Dept | Low. ED | 1948 | ||||||||
Lydney | LYD 175 |
1875 1875 |
1868 | 02/03/1964 | SWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
M&GN Joint Railway | M&GN | 1850 | 1850 | |||||||
Macclesfield | 9C | 1875 | 12/06/1961 | Map | ||||||
Machynlleth | MCH 119 89C 6F MN |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
03/01/1863 | 05/12/1966 | GWR | GWR | LMR | Map | ||
Mallaig | Fw 63d 65j 63b |
1875 01/02/1950 01/05/1955 01/06/1960 |
01/04/1901 | 18/06/1962 | Map | |||||
Malton | MAL 50F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1853 | 15/04/1963 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Malvern (MR) | 4M 4b M4M |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 |
16/05/1864 | 14/09/1931 | MR | LMS | Map | |||
Manchester Division | D09 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Manningham | 29 M29 20E 55F |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1957 |
1872 | 30/04/1967 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Mansfield | 18M 18a M18M 16D 16C |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/10/1955 |
09/10/1849 | 01/04/1960 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
March | MAR 31B MC MR |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 02/09/1973 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Margam | 87B MG |
01/03/1964 06/05/1973 |
03/1964 | 17/09/2009 | WR | |||||
Market Harborough | 2F 15F |
01/10/1955 20/04/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Marylebone | 14F 1D ME |
01/06/1961 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1897 | GCR | LNER | LMR | Map | |||
Melton Constable | MC 32G |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Merthyr Tydfil | 68 MTHR 88D |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
02/11/1964 | Map | ||||||
Methil | Thj | 05/05/1887 | 05/05/1887 | 1958 | WBR | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Mexborough | MEX 36B 41F |
1875 01/02/1950 31/03/1958 |
09/09/1963 | 02/03/1964 | Map | |||||
Middlesbrough | MID 51D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1866 | 31/05/1958 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Middleton in Teesdale | Dar 51a |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1869 | 16/09/1957 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Millerhill | 64A MH |
01/04/1967 06/05/1973 |
||||||||
Mirfield | 25D 56D |
1875 01/09/1956 |
LYR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||||
Mold Junction | 6B | 1875 | 01/10/1890 | 18/04/1966 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Monument Lane | 3E 21E 2H |
1875 01/02/1960 01/09/1963 |
12/02/1962 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Moor Row | 12E | 1875 | Map | |||||||
Motherwell | 28A 66B ML |
01/01/1930 01/01/1949 06/05/1973 |
01/05/1967 | Map | ||||||
Neasden | NEA 34E 14D |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 |
15/03/1899 | 18/06/1962 | GCR | LNER | LMR | Map | ||
Neath (Court Sart) | 137 NEA 87A |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Neville Hill | NEV 50B 55H NL |
1875 01/02/1950 01/01/1960 06/05/1973 |
10/1894 | 12/06/1966 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
New England | NWE 35A 34E |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 |
1852 | 01/1965 | GNR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
New Holland | ? | 01/03/1848 | 01/03/1848 | 20/04/1941 | MSLR | LNER | Map | |||
Newhaven | NHN | 1875 | ||||||||
Newport (I.O.W.) | NPT 71E 70G |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1954 |
Map | |||||||
Newport (Teeside) | NPT 51B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
11/1890 | 01/06/1958 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Newport Pill | 106 PILL PILL 86B |
1875 1875 01/01/1898 01/02/1950 |
1898 | 17/06/1963 | ANDR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Newton Abbot | 133 NA 83A NA |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Newton Abbot Factory | NA fact | 1850 | 1850 | 31/12/1947 | GWR | GWR | ||||
Newton Heath | 26A 9D NH |
1875 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Neyland | 167 NEY 87H |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Nine Elms | 9E 70A |
1875 01/02/1950 |
09/07/1967 | LSWR | SR | SR | Map | |||
Normanton | 20D 55E |
1875 01/02/1957 |
01/01/1968 | Map | ||||||
Northallerton | NLN 51J |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Northam | - | 1840 | 10/1840 | 01/1903 | LSWR | Map | ||||
Northampton | 2C 4B 2E 1H |
1875 01/07/1950 01/03/1952 01/09/1963 |
27/09/1965 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Northwich | NTH 13D 39J 9G 8E |
1875 01/01/1935 01/02/1950 22/05/1950 20/04/1958 |
04/03/1968 | Map | ||||||
Norwich Thorpe | NOR 32A NO NR NC |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 02/09/1973 01/12/1983 |
30/04/1844 | 02/04/1962 | 1990 | YNR | LNER | ER | Map | |
Norwood Junction | NORW 75C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Nottingham | 18 M18 16A 16D NM |
1868 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1868 | 04/04/1965 | 11/1967 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | |
Nottingham Division | D16 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Nuneaton | 2D 2B 5E |
1875 01/07/1950 01/09/1963 |
13/07/1847 | 06/06/1966 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Oban | 31C 63E 63D 63C |
1875 01/02/1950 01/05/1955 01/11/1959 |
Map | |||||||
Okehampton | - | 1879 | 1879 | 1964 | LSWR | SR | SR | Map | ||
Old Oak Common | 101 PDN 81A OC |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
17/03/1906 | 22/03/1965 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Oswestry | 129 OSW 89A 89D 6E |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 01/09/1963 |
18/01/1965 | Map | ||||||
Oxenholme | 11D 11C 12G |
1875 01/02/1950 01/06/1960 |
1880 | 18/06/1962 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Oxford | 111 OXF 81F OX |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
01/04/1854 | 03/01/1966 | OWWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Oxley | 114 OXY 84B 2B |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
01/07/1907 | 06/03/1967 | GWR | GWR | LMR | Map | ||
Pantyffynnon | 177 PFN |
1875 1875 |
03/1931 | 08/1964 | Map | |||||
Parkeston Quay | PKS 30F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Parkhead | PKD 65C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
18/10/1965 | Map | ||||||
Patricroft | 10C 26F 9H |
1875 01/02/1958 01/09/1963 |
LMS | LMR | Map | |||||
Penrith | 12C 12B |
1875 01/10/1955 |
Map | |||||||
Penzance | 153 PZ 83G 84D PZ |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Percy Main | PMN 52E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1855 | 28/02/1965 | 27/02/1966 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | |
Perth (LNER) | PTH | 1875 | 07/01/1950 | NBR | LNER | ScR | Map | |||
Perth South | 29A 63A PH |
01/05/1938 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
14/05/1938 | 14/05/1967 | 05/10/1969 | LMS | ScR | Map | ||
Peterborough East | Nwe | 10/12/1846 | 10/12/1846 | 30/04/1939 | ECR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Pickering | MALs 50Fs |
1875 01/02/1950 |
07/07/1845 | 06/04/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Plaistow | 13A PLS 33A |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
02/11/1959 | Map | ||||||
Plodder Lane | 10D | 1875 | Map | |||||||
Plymouth Friary | PLY 72D 83H |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Polmadie | 27A 66A PO |
01/01/1930 01/01/1949 06/05/1973 |
01/05/1967 | Map | ||||||
Polmont | POL 64E 65K |
1875 01/02/1950 01/06/1960 |
Map | |||||||
Pontypool Road | 126 PPRD 86G |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Preston | 10B 24K |
1875 01/02/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Preston Division | D10 | 16/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Radyr | 98 RYR 88A 88B |
1875 1875 01/12/1957 10/09/1960 |
26/07/1965 | Map | ||||||
Ramsgate | RAM 74B 73G RM RE RM |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 06/05/1973 01/12/1976 01/09/1999 |
Map | |||||||
Reading (S.R.) | RDG 70E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Reading (W.R.) | 121 RDG 81D RG |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||||
Reddish | 39a 9h 9g 9C RS |
01/06/1954 01/02/1958 20/04/1958 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Redditch | 3R 3c M3R 21a 2e |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 |
1872 | 01/06/1964 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Redhill | RED 75B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
12/1965 | Map | ||||||
Reedsmouth | Twd 52c |
01/08/1924 01/01/1949 |
01/07/1862 | 15/09/1952 | BCR | LNER | ScR | Map | ||
Research Department (Derby) | 92D | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
Research Department (Toton) | 92T | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | RET 36E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
16/07/1849 | 01/1965 | MSLR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Rhyl | 38R W38R 7D 6K |
04/1899 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/03/1952 |
11/02/1963 | Map | ||||||
Rhymney | 108 RHY 88D |
1875 1875 01/11/1964 |
Map | |||||||
Richmond | Dar | 1875 | 10/09/1846 | 30/12/1933 | Y&NR | LNER | Map | |||
Robin Hood | ? | 27/03/1861 | 27/03/1861 | 07/1926 | EWYUR | LNER | Map | |||
Rose Grove | 24B 10F |
1875 01/09/1963 |
05/08/1968 | Map | ||||||
Rothbury | Nbh 52f |
1870 01/02/1950 |
1870 | 15/09/1952 | NBR | LNER | ScR | Map | ||
Rowsley | 17D 17C 16J |
01/01/1924 20/04/1958 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Royston | 20C 55D |
1875 01/02/1957 |
Map | |||||||
Rugby | 2A 1F |
1875 09/09/1963 |
24/05/1965 | 31/12/1968 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
RugbyTesting Station | RTS | 1900 | ||||||||
Ryde (I.O.W) | RYD | 1875 | ||||||||
Ryde (I.O.W.) | RYD 71F 70H RY |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1954 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Ryecroft (Walsall) | W9 3C 21F 2G |
01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/06/1960 01/09/1963 |
1878 | 09/06/1958 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Salisbury | SAL 72B 70E |
1875 01/02/1950 30/12/1962 |
09/07/1967 | Map | ||||||
Salisbury (GWR) | Wes 82d |
1858 01/02/1950 |
1899 | 11/1950 | GWR | GWR | Map | |||
Saltburn | SALT 51K |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Saltley | 3 M3 21A 2E SY |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1868 | 06/03/1967 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Scarborough | SCA 50E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
20/05/1963 | Map | ||||||
Selby | SEL 50C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1871 | 13/09/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Selhurst | 75C SU |
27/08/1966 06/05/1973 |
SR | |||||||
Severn Tunnel Junction | 136 STJ 86E ST |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||||
Sheffield Darnall | SHF 39B 41A 41B DA |
11/04/1943 01/02/1950 01/06/1955 01/04/1964 06/05/1973 |
11/04/1943 | 17/06/1963 | 04/10/1965 | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 25 M25 19A 41B |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1958 |
1877 | 11/09/1961 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Sheffield Millhouses | 19B 41C |
01/01/1935 01/02/1958 |
1901 | 01/01/1962 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Sheffield Neepsend | SHF | 1875 | 10/04/1943 | MSLR | LNER | Map | ||||
Shildon | SHI | 1892 | 1892 | 08/07/1935 | NER | LNER | Map | |||
Shirebrook | 41J SB |
08/02/1966 06/05/1973 |
14/06/1965 | ER | Map | |||||
Shoeburyness | 13D 33C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Shrewsbury | 134 SALOP 4A 84G 89A 6D |
1875 1875 01/01/1935 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 01/09/1963 |
06/03/1967 | 13/07/1971 | Map | |||||
Skipton | 30 M30 20F 23A 20F 24G 10G |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/06/1950 07/10/1951 01/02/1957 01/09/1963 |
1877 | 03/04/1967 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Slade Green | SLG SG |
1901 06/05/1973 |
27/10/1899 | SECR | SR | SR | Map | |||
Slough | 141 SLO 81B |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
11/1840 | 01/06/1964 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
South Gosforth | ? 52J GF |
1935 01/02/1964 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
South Lynn | SL 31D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
LNER | ER | Map | |||||
Southall | 131 SHL 81C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
1884 | 03/01/1966 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Southampton Docks | SOT 71I 70I |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
01/1966 | Map | ||||||
Southend on Sea | ? 30D |
1900 01/02/1950 |
01/03/1856 | 18/06/1962 | LTSR | LMS | ER | Map | ||
Southend Victoria | STR 30A |
01/10/1889 01/02/1950 |
01/10/1889 | 1957 | GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Southport | 23C 27C 8M |
01/01/1935 01/06/1950 01/09/1963 |
03/1890 | 06/06/1966 | LYR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Southwell | 18S 18d M18S 16a |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
07/1847 | 10/01/1955 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Sowerby Bridge | 25E 56E |
1875 01/09/1956 |
Map | |||||||
Speke Junction | 8C | 1875 | 06/05/1968 | Map | ||||||
Spital Bridge | 9 M9 16B 35C 31F |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/08/1950 01/07/1958 |
1872 | 01/02/1960 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Springs Branch (Wigan) | 10A 8F SP |
1875 20/04/1958 06/05/1973 |
04/12/1967 | |||||||
St Albans | 15S M15S 14C |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
1868 | 11/01/1960 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
St Blazey | 173 SBZ 83E 84B BZ |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
01/06/1874 | 04/1962 | 25/04/1987 | CMR | GWR | WR | Map | |
St Leonards | STL 74E 73D SE |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1963 06/05/1973 |
||||||||
St Margarets | STM 64A |
1875 01/02/1949 |
1866 | 01/05/1967 | NBR | LNER | ScR | Map | ||
St Philips Marsh | SPM 32 82B |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
07/1910 | 17/06/1964 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
St Rollox (Balornock) | 31A 65B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
07/11/1966 | CR | LMS | SCR | Map | |||
Stafford | 5C | 1875 | 19/07/1965 | Map | ||||||
Stafford Road | 194 SRD 84A |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
14/11/1854 | 09/09/1963 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Stafford Road Factory | SR Fact | 1850 | 1850 | 31/12/1947 | GWR | GWR | ||||
Starbeck | SBK 29H M29H 50D |
1875 1875 01/01/1923 01/02/1950 |
1857 | 13/09/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 24 M24 18D 41E BH |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1958 06/05/1973 |
1870 | 11/02/1991 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Staveley (G.C.) | STV 38D 41H |
1875 01/02/1950 01/05/1958 |
01/06/1892 | 14/06/1965 | MSLR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Stewarts Lane | BAT 73A 75D SL |
1875 01/02/1950 01/06/1962 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Stirling | STG 31B 63B 65J |
1875 1875 01/01/1950 01/06/1960 |
1850 | 13/06/1966 | CR | LMS | ScR | Map | ||
Stockport Edgeley | 9B | 1875 | 06/05/1968 | Map | ||||||
Stockton | SKN 51E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1891 | 13/06/1959 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Stoke | 5D | 1875 | 07/08/1967 | Map | ||||||
Stoke Division | D05 | 18/04/1966 | 16/01/1965 | |||||||
Stourbridge Junction | 154 STB 84F 2C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
1870 | 11/07/1966 | GWR | GWR | LMR | Map | ||
Stourton | 20B 55B |
1875 01/02/1957 |
Map | |||||||
Stranraer | 12H 68C 67F |
1875 01/01/1949 01/07/1962 |
12/03/1861 | 10/1966 | GSWR | LMS | SCR | Map | ||
Stratford | STR 30A SX SF |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 02/09/1973 |
GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||||
Stratford upon Avon | 21D | 1875 | ||||||||
Stroud | 7S | 1875 | 16/11/1885 | 1900 | MR | Map | ||||
Sunderland | SUN 54A 52G |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
1857 | 17/09/1967 | NER | LNER | NE | |||
Sutton Oak | 10E 10D 8G |
1875 01/10/1955 20/04/1958 |
1880 | 19/06/1967 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Swansea (Upper Bank) | 6 M6 W33UB 4C 87k |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1929 01/01/1935 01/02/1950 |
1893 | 04/02/1963 | MR | LMS | WR | Map | ||
Swansea East Dock | 197 SED 87D |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4B 87K |
1875 01/02/1950 |
06/01/1882 | 31/08/1959 | LNWR | LMS | WR | Map | ||
Swindon | 132 SDN 82C SW |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
1842 | 10/1964 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Swindon 'F' Pool | SW 'F' | 1850 | 1850 | 31/12/1947 | ||||||
Swindon Stock shed | SW Stock | 1850 | 1882 | 10/1964 | GWR | GWR | Map | |||
Swindon Works | Sw Wks ZL |
1900 01/01/1965 |
WR | |||||||
Taunton | 203 TN 83B |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Tebay | 11E 11D 12H 12E |
1875 01/02/1950 01/06/1960 01/09/1963 |
01/01/1968 | Map | ||||||
Templecombe (S&D) | 22D 71H 82G 83G |
1877 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 01/10/1963 |
31/08/1863 | 03/1966 | SDR | LMS | WR | Map | ||
Tewkesbury | 7T 7a M7T 22b 85e 85c |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/02/1958 10/09/1960 |
21/07/1840 | 07/09/1962 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Thirsk | TSK | 1887 | 1887 | 10/11/1930 | NER | LNER | Map | |||
Thornaby | 51L TE |
01/06/1958 06/05/1973 |
NE | Map | ||||||
Thornbury | 8Th 8b M8Th 22a |
1875 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 |
02/09/1872 | 19/06/1944 | MR | LMS | Map | |||
Thornton Junction | THJ 62A TJ |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
1933 | 06/09/1969 | LNER | SCR | Map | |||
Three Bridges | 3B 75E |
1875 01/02/1950 |
27/01/1964 | Map | ||||||
Tilbury | 13C 33B |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Tinsley | 41A TI |
01/04/1964 06/05/1973 |
1965 | 1998 | ER | Map | ||||
To Eastern Region | 91E | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
To LNWR | ? | |||||||||
To London Midland Region | 91M | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
To North Eastern Region | 91N | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
To Scottish Region | 91X | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
To Southern Region | 91S | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
To Western Region / GWR | 91W | 01/01/1800 | ||||||||
Tonbridge | TON 74D 73J |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Tondu | 146 TDU 86F 88H |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 10/09/1960 |
Map | |||||||
Toton | 17 M17 18A 16A TO |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1870 | 12/1965 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Trafford Park (LMS) | 19G 13A 9E 17F 9E |
1875 01/01/1950 22/05/1950 01/01/1957 20/04/1958 |
04/03/1968 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | |||
Trafford Park (LNER) | TFD | 1875 | 04/03/1968 | GNR | LNER | LMR | Map | |||
Tredegar | 4E 86K |
01/01/1935 01/11/1954 |
1863 | 11/06/1960 | LMS | WR | Map | |||
Treherbert | 128 THT 88F |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 |
01/03/1965 | Map | ||||||
Truro | 213 TR 83F 84C |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Tunbridge Wells West | TWW 75F TW |
1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
Map | |||||||
Tuxford | TUX 40D 41K |
1875 01/02/1950 01/07/1958 |
Map | |||||||
Tweedmouth | TWD 52D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1877 | 19/06/1966 | NER | LNER | SCR | Map | ||
Tyne Dock | TDK 54B 52H |
1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1958 |
1862 | 09/09/1967 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Tyseley | TYS 174 84E 2A TS |
1875 1875 01/01/1950 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
06/1908 | 07/11/1966 | GWR | GWR | LMR | Map | ||
Unallocated | n/a | 1800 | ||||||||
Upminster | M36 13E 33a |
1931 01/01/1935 01/01/1950 |
1931 | 17/09/1956 | LTSR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Uttoxeter | 5F | 1875 | 07/12/1964 | Map | ||||||
Wadebridge | WAD 72F 84E |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Wakefield | C6 25A 56A |
01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1956 |
1847 | 03/06/1967 | LYR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Walsall Pleck | 3W 3b M3W |
1880 01/01/1911 01/01/1923 |
1880 | 02/09/1925 | MR | LMS | Map | |||
Walton on the Hill | 13F WAL 27E 8R |
1875 01/01/1935 01/05/1950 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Warrington Dallam | 8B | 1875 | 02/10/1967 | Map | ||||||
Warwick | 2E 2C |
1875 01/07/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Watford | 1C WJ |
1875 06/05/1973 |
1856 | 29/03/1965 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Wath | 36b 41f 41C WH |
01/04/1952 01/07/1958 04/11/1963 06/05/1973 |
01/1983 | Map | ||||||
WCML Electric (Crewe) | 5H | 01/10/1963 | ||||||||
Wear Valley Junction | Auk | 12/1876 | 12/1876 | 08/07/1935 | NER | LNER | Map | |||
Wellingborough | 13 M13 15A 15B WO |
1875 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
1868 | 13/06/1966 | 29/03/1969 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | |
Wellington | 184 WLN 84H 2M |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
West Auckland | AUK 51F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1887 | 02/02/1964 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
West Hartlepool | WHL 51C |
1875 01/02/1950 |
1867 | 17/09/1967 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Westbury | 172 WES 82D 83C WY |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/10/1963 06/05/1973 |
02/1915 | 09/1965 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Western Lines (LMR) | WL | 01/01/1965 | ||||||||
Westhouses | 18B 16G WU WT |
1875 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 05/01/1975 |
1890 | 03/10/1966 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Weston-super-Mare | Brd 82a |
1850 01/02/1950 |
01/04/1851 | 08/1960 | BER | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 162 WEY 82F 71G 70G |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 01/09/1963 |
09/07/1967 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Whitby | WBY 50G |
1875 01/02/1950 |
Map | |||||||
Whitland | 217 WTD 87H |
1875 1875 01/10/1963 |
01/1966 | WR | Map | |||||
Wick | 32a 60D |
28/07/1874 01/01/1949 |
Map | |||||||
Widnes | 8D | 1875 | Map | |||||||
Wigan Central (L&Y) | 23D 27D 8P |
1875 01/06/1950 01/09/1963 |
Map | |||||||
Wigston | 11 M11 |
1873 01/01/1923 |
1873 | 04/1955 | MR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Willesden | 2 W2 1A WN |
06/1874 01/01/1923 01/01/1935 06/05/1973 |
1873 | 27/09/1965 | LNWR | LMS | LMR | Map | ||
Windsor (Southern) | - | 01/10/1849 | 01/10/1849 | 1940 | LSWr | SR | Map | |||
Woking | - | 1838 | 1838 | 1897 | LSWR | Map | ||||
Wolverton Works | 99W | 1900 | ||||||||
Woodford Halse | WFD 38E 2G 2F 1G |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 20/04/1958 01/09/1963 |
1897 | 14/06/1965 | GCR | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Worcester | 215 WOS 85A WS |
1875 1875 01/02/1950 06/05/1973 |
12/1965 | 1985 | GWR | WR | Map | |||
Worcester (MR) | 4 M4 |
1875 01/01/1923 |
1870 | 12/12/1932 | MR | LMS | Map | |||
Workington | 12D 12C 11B 12F 12D WK |
1875 01/10/1955 20/04/1958 01/06/1960 01/09/1963 06/05/1973 |
01/01/1968 | Map | ||||||
Wrexham Rhosddu | WRX 6E 84K |
1875 01/02/1950 01/02/1958 |
01/01/1866 | 04/01/1960 | WMCQR | LNER | LMR | Map | ||
Yarmouth Beach | YB 32F |
1875 01/02/1950 |
02/03/1959 | MGNR | LNER | ER | Map | |||
Yarmouth South Town | YAR 32D |
1875 01/02/1950 |
01/06/1859 | 02/11/1959 | GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Yarmouth Vauxhall | 32E | 1875 | 12/03/1883 | 05/01/1959 | GER | LNER | ER | Map | ||
Yeovil Pen Mill | 82E 192 71H |
1875 1875 01/02/1958 |
01/09/1856 | 05/01/1959 | GWR | GWR | WR | Map | ||
Yeovil Town | YEO 72C 83E |
1875 01/02/1950 01/09/1963 |
19/07/1860 | 06/1965 | EYR | SR | SR | Map | ||
Yoker | 31e 65G |
03/1907 01/02/1950 |
03/1907 | 03/1961 | 01/1964 | CR | LMS | SCR | Map | |
York (North) | YK 50A 55B YK |
1875 01/02/1950 01/12/1967 06/05/1973 |
1878 | 25/06/1967 | 03/1984 | NER | LNER | ER | Map | |
York Layerthorpe | Yk 50a |
1919 01/02/1950 |
1919 | 1965 | DVLR | LNER | ER | Map |