Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 263 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11189 Week
» 104423 Month
» 564364 Year
» 5003801 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Cambridge
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Cambridge |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CAM | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 31A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | CA | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Closed |
18/06/1962 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GER |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line at the north end of the
station. The yard is visible from the line.
The shed entrance is in hte station yard.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to CAM | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 31A | 18/06/1962 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to CA |
|
|
|