Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1017 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18820 Week
» 71836 Month
» 191363 Year
» 3218216 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Camden
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Camden |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 1B | 01/01/1923 | 03/01/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
20/06/1837 |
Date Closed |
03/01/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
Originally opened by the London and Birmingham Railway. Used for the stabling of diesel locomotives awaiting return workings after closure. |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the main line about 1½ miles north
of Euston Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Cross the railway bridge (Regents Park Road) opposite Chalk Farm
(L.P.T.B.) Station into Gloucester Road. Turn left into Dumpton Place,
and the shed entrance is at the end of this short cul-de-sac. Walking
time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 20/06/1837 | Depot opened | 1863 | Change of code to 1 | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to W1 | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 1B | 09/09/1963 | Closed to steam locomotives | 03/01/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|