Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 426 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11352 Week
» 104586 Month
» 564527 Year
» 5003964 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Cardiff Canton
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Cardiff Canton |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CDF (66) | 01/01/1882 | 31/01/1950 | 86C | 01/02/1950 | 09/09/1960 | 88A | 10/09/1960 | 31/08/1963 | 86A | 01/09/1963 | 05/05/1973 | CF | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1882 |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
NEWPORT |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the main line west of Cardiff General
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Cardiff General Station along Saunders Road. Turn
left along Wood Street, continue along Tudor Road, and then Ninian
Park Road. Turn left into De Croche Place (a short cul-de-sac), about
200 yards past the junction of Clare Road. A footbridge leads to the shed
from the end of this cul-de-sac. Walking time 10 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 66 | 1882 | Depot opened | 01/01/1882 | Change of code to CDF | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 86C | 10/09/1960 | Change of code to 88A | 09/1962 | Closed to steam locomotives | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 86A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to CF |
|
|
|