Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 314 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11240 Week
» 104474 Month
» 564415 Year
» 5003852 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Aintree
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Aintree |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 23B | 1875 | 31/05/1950 | 27B | 01/06/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 8L | 01/09/1963 | 12/06/1967 |
|
Date Closed |
12/06/1967 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
Built in 1886 |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Ford-Aintree and Ford-Kirkby lines.
The yard is visible from the lines.
Turn right outside Aintree C.L.C. Station, or left outside Aintree
L.M.S. Station into Park Lane. Turn right into Aintree Road and continue into Warbeck Moor.
Go under the railway bridge, and turn second
right into Helsby Road. Continue along a cinder road over one railway
bridge, and under another. This leads to the shed. Walking time 15
minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 23B | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 27B | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 8L | 12/06/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|