Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3391 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13685 Week
» 149090 Month
» 609031 Year
» 5048468 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Carlisle Upperby
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Carlisle Upperby |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W29 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 12B | 01/01/1923 | 09/06/1950 | 12A | 10/06/1950 | 31/01/1958 | 12B | 01/02/1958 | 31/12/1967 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the main Penrith line south of
Carlisle Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Leave Carlisle Station by the main entrance, and go straight ahead
into Court Square. Turn right into Botchergate, and continue into
London Road. Turn right into Tyne Street (just past the railway underbridge). This is a short cul-de~sac, and a cinder path leads to the shed
from a gate at the end. Walking time 20 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 12B | 10/06/1950 | Change of code to 12A | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 12B | 12/12/1966 | Closed to steam locomotives |
|
|
|