Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 377 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11303 Week
» 104537 Month
» 564478 Year
» 5003915 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Colwick
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Colwick |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CLK | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 38A | 01/02/1950 | 30/06/1958 | 40E | 01/07/1958 | 03/01/1966 | 16B | 03/01/1966 | 31/03/1970 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line between Netherfield and
Colwick, and Gedling and Carlton Stations. The yard is visible from
the line.
Turn right outside Netherfield and Colwick L.N.E.R. Station into
Meadow Road. Turn right at the cross roads into Victoria Road, and
the shed entrance is on the left hand side just past the level crossing.
Walking time 10 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to CLK | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 38A | 01/07/1958 | Change of code to 40E | 03/01/1966 | Change of code to 16B | 12/12/1966 | Closed to steam locomotives |
|
|
|