Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1305 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14711 Week
» 67727 Month
» 187254 Year
» 3214107 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Cudworth
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Cudworth |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CUD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 53E | 01/02/1950 | 30/07/1951 |
|
Date Opened |
20/07/1885 |
Date Closed |
30/07/1951 |
Pre Grouping Company |
HBR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the L.N.E.R. line about 1¾ miles
north of Cudworth L.M.S. Station. The L.N.E.R. line is closed to
passenger traffic, but the yard is partially visible from the main L.M.S.
Leeds line.
Turn left outside Royston and Notton L.M.S. Station into Lund
Hill Lane. Turn left into Cross Lane, and continue to the end. Turn
left into Pools Lane, and almost immediately right into a path known
as Boulder Bridge Lane. Continue along this path under the railway
embankment, and the shed entrance is on the left hand side. Walking
time 20 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to CUD | 20/07/1885 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 53E | 30/07/1951 | Depot closed |
|
|
|