Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3624 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13918 Week
» 149323 Month
» 609264 Year
» 5048701 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Darlington
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Darlington |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | DAR | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 51A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | DN | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line north of Darlington Bank
Top Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Leave Darlington Bank Top Station by the approach road running north. Turn right under the bridge into Parkgate, and fork left
into Yarm Road. Turn left into Green Street. This is a cul-de-sac,
and a broad path leads from the end to the shed. Walking time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to DAR | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 51A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to DN |
|
|
|