Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 317 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11243 Week
» 104477 Month
» 564418 Year
» 5003855 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Dover Marine
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Dover Marine |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | DOV | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 74C | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1958 | 73H | 01/10/1958 | 31/05/1961 |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line west of Dover Marine
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
From Dover Marine Station.
A cinder path runs along the side of the line to the shed from a level
crossing opposite the entrance to Dover Marine Station.
From Dover Priory Station.
Turn left outside Dover Priory Station into Folkestone Road, and
continue into St. Martin’s Hill. Turn right into Cannon Street, and
continue into King Street and Bench Street. Turn right into Snargate
Street, bear right into Limekiln Street, and continue along The
Viaduct. Turn right by the dock entrance to the level crossing outside
Dover Marine Station. Walking time 25 minutes.
Note.-Dover Marine Station is temporarily closed to ordinary
passenger traffic. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to DOV | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 74C | 01/10/1958 | Change of code to 73H |
|
|
|