Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17871 Week
» 70887 Month
» 190414 Year
» 3217267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Stockport Edgeley
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Stockport Edgeley |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 16S | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W16S | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 9B | 01/01/1923 | 06/05/1968 |
|
Date Closed |
06/05/1968 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line, south of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead outside the station along Station Road. Turn right into Wellington Road, and right again into Greek Street. Turn
left into Shaw Heath, and right into Booth Street. A cinder path leads
to the shed from a gate on the left handside of this road. Walking
time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 9B | 06/05/1968 | Depot closed |
|
|
|