Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2041 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19844 Week
» 72860 Month
» 192387 Year
» 3219240 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Farnley Junction
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Farnley Junction |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 17 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W17 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 25G | 01/01/1923 | 31/08/1956 | 55C | 01/09/1956 | 31/10/1966 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line south of Farnley and
Wortley Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Farnley and Wortley Station along Whitehall
Road. Turn left into Royds Lane, and bear right along a rough road
just before the railway overbridge. This leads up a hill and gradually
turns into a cinder path. The shed is at the top of the hill. Walking
time 15 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 25G | 01/09/1956 | Change of code to 55C |
|
|
|