Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 273 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11199 Week
» 104433 Month
» 564374 Year
» 5003811 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Feltham
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Feltham |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | FEL | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 70B | 01/02/1950 | 31/07/1970 |
|
Date Closed |
22/07/1970 |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The
yard is partially visiblefrom the line.
Go straight ahead outside Hounslow S.R. Station along Station
Road and turn left into HanWorth Road. Continue along this road
for about a mile, and a cinder path leads to the shed from the right
hand side, opposite the junction of Powder Mill Lane. Walking time
25 minutes.
The No. 110 and 111 bus routes operate along Hanworth Road
between Station Road and Powder Mill Lane.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to FEL | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 70B | 22/07/1970 | Depot closed |
|
|
|