Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 605 Today
» 5387 Yesterday
» 29182 Week
» 89476 Month
» 549417 Year
» 4988854 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Fratton
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Fratton |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | FRA | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 71D | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1954 | 70F | 01/09/1954 | 31/08/1963 | FR | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line north of the station. The
yard is partially visible from the line.
Leave the station by the southern exit, and turn left into Goldsmith
Avenue. Pass the car sheds, and a cinder path leads to the shed from the
left hand side of this road. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to FRA | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 71D | 01/09/1954 | Change of code to 70F | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to FR |
|
|
|