Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Gloucester Barnwood


Depot Details
Depot Name Gloucester Barnwood
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
7187531/12/1922
M701/01/192331/01/1935
22B01/02/193531/01/1958
85E01/02/195809/09/1960
85C10/09/196030/04/1964
Date Opened 08/07/1850
Date Closed 04/05/1964
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information The opening date refers to the previous MR depot at Gloucester which was closed and demolished in 1895 to make way for a new station - Gloucester Barnwood was opened as a replacement in that year.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
08/07/1850Depot opened
1875Change of code to 7
01/01/1923Change of code to M7
01/01/1935Change of code to 22B
01/02/1958Change of code to 85E
10/09/1960Change of code to 85C
04/05/1964Depot closed