Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3513 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16919 Week
» 69935 Month
» 189462 Year
» 3216315 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Grantham
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Grantham |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | GRA | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 35B | 01/02/1950 | 28/02/1958 | 34F | 01/03/1958 | 31/08/1963 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the west side of the station. The yard is visible
from the line.
Turn left outside the station into Station Road, and almost immediately left a1ong a subway running under the railway. The shed
entrance is on the left hand side immediately past the end of this subway.
Walking time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to GRA | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 35B | 01/03/1958 | Change of code to 34F |
|
|
|