Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hasland


Depot Details
Depot Name Hasland
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
23187531/12/1922
M2301/01/192331/01/1935
18C01/02/193531/08/1963
16H01/09/196331/08/1964
Date Opened 1875
Date Closed 07/09/1964
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the main line about 1¾ miles south of Chesterfield Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Bear left outside Chesterfield L.M.S. Station into Corporation Street. Turn left into St. Marys Gate, and continue into Lordsmill Street. Fork right into Derby Road (A61), and continue along this road for about one mile. Turn left into Storforth Lane, and continue under the railway bridge. Turn right immediately along North Terrace (parallel to the railway). Turn left at the end, and almost immediately right. This turning is a tarmac path that leads to the shed. Walking time 50 minutes.

The Storforth Lane Circular bus route operates between Vicar Lane bus station in Chesterfield, and the railway bridge in Storforth Lane.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Depot opened
1875Change of code to 23
01/01/1923Change of code to M23
01/01/1935Change of code to 18C
01/09/1963Change of code to 16H
07/09/1964Depot closed