Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 7733 Today
» 7473 Yesterday
» 31073 Week
» 124307 Month
» 584248 Year
» 5023685 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Haverton Hill
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Haverton Hill |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | HAV | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 51G | 01/02/1950 | 14/06/1959 |
|
Date Opened |
1899 |
Date Closed |
14/06/1959 |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line west of the station. The
yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside Middlesbrough Station into Exchange Street.
Continue into Queen’s Square, Cliveland Street, Durham Street, and
Ferry Road. Cross the River Tees by means of the transporter bridge
(toll). Go straight ahead and turn first right, and then left with this
road, passing Port Clarence Station (closed). Turn left at the end along
Port Clarence Road (A 1046), and continue for about a mile. Fork
left along the main Stockton road, passing Haverton Hill Station on the
right. About 200 yards further on, a cinder path leads across some fields
on the right-hand side, to the shed.
Haverton Hill Station is still open, but very few trains call there.
A bus service operates from Stockton past the shed.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to HAV | 1899 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 51G | 13/06/1959 | Depot closed |
|
|
|