Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1483 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14889 Week
» 67905 Month
» 187432 Year
» 3214285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Hereford
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Hereford |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | HFD (95) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 85C | 01/02/1950 | 09/09/1960 | 86C | 10/09/1960 | 31/10/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
WORCESTER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Hereford avoiding line (goods)
by Barton Goods Yard.
Turn left outside the station along Station Road, and right into
Commercial Road. Continue along High Town and High Street into
Eign Street. Turn left into Victoria Road, right into Barton Street, and
continue into Barton Road. The shed entrance is a gate on the right
hand side just past the railway underbridge. Walking time 25 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 95 | 1875 | Change of code to HFD | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 85C | 10/09/1960 | Change of code to 86C |
|
|
|