Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3365 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13659 Week
» 149064 Month
» 609005 Year
» 5048442 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Inverness
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Inverness |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29H | 09/1863 | 31/12/1939 | 32A | 01/01/1940 | 31/12/1948 | 60A | 01/01/1949 | 05/05/1973 | IS | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
09/1863 |
Date Closed |
06/1961 |
Pre Grouping Company |
HR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
SCR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the main Perth line east of the
station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station into Academy Street, and continue into
Inglis Street. Turn left at the end into Eastgate, and the shed entrance
is on the left hand side about ¼ mile further on. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 32A | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 60A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to IS |
|
|
|