Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3665 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13959 Week
» 149364 Month
» 609305 Year
» 5048742 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Kings Cross
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Kings Cross |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | KX | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 34A | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1963 | KX | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
Information |
Top Shed |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in King’s Cross goods yard. It is not visible from
the main line.
Turn sharp left outside King’s Cross Station along York Way
(running parallel to, and at the east side of the main line). A cobbled
way leads round the perimeter of the goods yard to the shed, from an
entrance on the left hand side of York Way just past the junction of
Goods Way. Walking time 15 minutes.
See also under London.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to KX | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 34A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to KX |
|
|
|