Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 53 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5584 Week
» 7322 Month
» 134765 Year
» 1800141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kirkby Stephen


Depot Details
Depot Name Kirkby Stephen
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
KBY187531/01/1950
51H01/02/195031/01/1958
12E01/02/195831/03/1958
12D01/04/195820/11/1961
Date Opened 07/08/1861
Date Closed 20/11/1961
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is adjacent to the north side of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Go ahead out of the short station approach road, and turn left into the main road. A path leads to the shed from a stile on the left- hand side a few yards further on.
Walking time less than 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
07/08/1861Depot opened
1875Change of code to KBY
01/02/1950Change of code to 51H
01/02/1958Change of code to 12E
01/04/1958Change of code to 12D
20/11/1961Depot closed