Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3418 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16824 Week
» 69840 Month
» 189367 Year
» 3216220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Leamington
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Leamington |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | LMTN (94) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 84D | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 2L | 01/09/1963 | 14/06/1965 |
|
Date Closed |
14/06/1965 |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
WOLVERHAMPTON |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line south of the station. The
yard is partially visible from the line, and from the L.M.S. Leamington-Rugby line.
Turn left outside Leamington G.W. Station into Old Warwick Road.
Continue into High Street, and Radford Road. Turn right into Camberwell Terrace, and continue along the cinder path that leads under the
railway bridges. There is a gate on the left hand side just past the
second bridge. A cinder path leads from this gate to the shed. Walking
time 15 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 94 | 1875 | Change of code to LMTN | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 84D | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 2L | 14/06/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|