Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 299 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1140 Week
» 15076 Month
» 142519 Year
» 1807895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Leicester (G.C.)


Depot Details
Depot Name Leicester (G.C.)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
LEI187531/01/1950
38C01/02/195031/01/1958
15E01/02/195831/08/1963
15D01/09/196306/07/1964
Date Opened 1897
Date Closed 06/07/1964
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line, south of Leicester Central Station. The yard is not visible from the line.
Turn right outside Leicester Central Station along Great Central Street. Turn right into St. Nicholas Street, and continue into Applegate Street. Turn right into West Bridge, continue into Duns Lane and then Braunstone Gate. Continue into Narborough Road, and after some distance turn left into Hopefield Road. Continue into Marlow Road, cross the railway bridge at the end, and turn left into a cinder path, running parallel to the line. This leads under the L.M.S. line to the shed.
Walking time 30 minutes.
A tram service, labelled Narborough Road, operates from the City over West Bridge to the end of Hopefield Road.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to LEI
1897Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 38C
01/02/1958Change of code to 15E
01/09/1963Change of code to 15D
06/07/1964Depot closed