Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Mansfield


Depot Details
Depot Name Mansfield
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
18M187531/12/1910
18a01/01/191131/12/1922
M18M01/01/192331/01/1935
16D01/02/193530/09/1955
16C01/10/195531/03/1960
Date Opened 09/10/1849
Date Closed 01/04/1960
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Mansfield-Kirkby line south of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn sharp left outside Mansfield L.M.S. Station into a short approach road, and turn left into Belvedere Street, changing to Portland Street under the railway bridge. Turn right into Quarry Lane and right into Bradder Street. This is a cul-de sac and the shed entrance is on the left, off a path that runs across the top of the street. Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
09/10/1849Depot opened
1875Change of code to 18M
01/01/1911Change of code to 18a
01/01/1923Change of code to M18M
01/01/1935Change of code to 16D
01/10/1955Change of code to 16C
01/04/1960Depot closed