Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 317 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11243 Week
» 104477 Month
» 564418 Year
» 5003855 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: March
Depot Details
Depot Name |
March |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | MAR | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 31B | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | MC | 06/05/1973 | 01/09/1973 | MR | 02/09/1973 | |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
GER |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the March-Spalding line. The yard
is partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station, and left over the level crossing. Turn
first left into Norwood Road. A broad cinder path leads to the shed
from the right hand side of this road just past the railway under-bridge.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Note: The shed consists of two separate buildings.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to MAR | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 31B | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to MC | 02/09/1973 | Change of code to MR |
|
|
|