Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 765 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14808 Week
» 79762 Month
» 282426 Year
» 3309279 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bangor
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bangor |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 21 | 01/01/1884 | 31/12/1922 | W21 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 7B | 01/01/1923 | 29/02/1952 | 6H | 01/03/1952 | 31/05/1965 |
|
Date Closed |
14/06/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 7B | 01/03/1952 | Change of code to 6H | 14/06/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|