Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 779 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14185 Week
» 67201 Month
» 186728 Year
» 3213581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Neasden
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Neasden |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | NEA | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 34E | 01/02/1950 | 31/01/1958 | 14D | 01/02/1958 | 31/05/1962 |
|
Date Opened |
15/03/1899 |
Date Closed |
18/06/1962 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line west of Neasden L.P.T.B.
Station. The top of the yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Neasden L.P.T.B. Station along Neasden Lane.
Turn right along a cinder path just before the railway over-bridge.
Continue under a railway bridge, and this path leads to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Note. There is also an entrance in North Circular Road.
See also under London.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to NEA | 15/03/1899 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 34E | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 14D | 18/06/1962 | Depot closed |
|
|
|