Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 585 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3511 Week
» 5249 Month
» 132692 Year
» 1798068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Northampton


Depot Details
Depot Name Northampton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
601/01/187531/12/1889
501/01/189031/12/1922
W501/01/192331/01/1935
2C01/02/193530/06/1950
4B01/07/195029/02/1952
2E01/03/195231/08/1963
1H01/09/196331/08/1965
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the Blisworth-Peterborough line. The yard is ivisible from this line.

Turn left out of Northampton Castle Station along West Bridge. Continue along Marefair and Gold Street. Turn right into Bridge Street, and continue into Cotton End. Cross over the level crossing by Bridge Street Station, turn right into St. Leonards Road. and continue along Muir Road parallel to the railway until a foot bridge over the line is reached. This gives direct access to the shed. Walking time 30 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 2C
01/07/1950Change of code to 4B
01/03/1952Change of code to 2E
01/09/1963Change of code to 1H
27/09/1965Closed to steam locomotives