Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4033 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19645 Week
» 118290 Month
» 320954 Year
» 3347807 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Norwood Junction
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Norwood Junction |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | NORW | 07/07/1935 | 31/01/1950 | 75C | 01/02/1950 | 26/08/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
07/07/1935 |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the Sydenham line north of the
station. The northbound Crystal Palace fly over runs at the other side
of the shed. The yard is visible from both lines.
Turn right outside the station along a footpath running parallel to
the line. Bear left at the end of this path, to the traffic lights and turn
right along High Street. A cinder path leads over a footbridge to the
shed from the left hand side of this road, (just past the railway underbridge). Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to NORW | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 75C |
|
|
|