Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3118 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16524 Week
» 69540 Month
» 189067 Year
» 3215920 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Parkhead
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Parkhead |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | PKD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 65C | 01/02/1950 | 30/11/1962 |
|
Date Closed |
18/10/1965 |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Parkhead Station into Duke Street. Turn left into
a cinder path by the fork of Duke Street and Shettleston Road. This
path leads to the shed. Walking time 5 minutes. See also under Glasgow.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to PKD | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 65C | 18/10/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|