Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 265 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11191 Week
» 104425 Month
» 564366 Year
» 5003803 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Rowsley
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Rowsley |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 17D | 01/01/1924 | 31/03/1958 | 17C | 01/04/1958 | 31/08/1963 | 16J | 01/09/1963 | 28/02/1967 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line, between Darley Dale and
Rowsley Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Rowsley Station into the main Derby Road (A6)
and bear right with this road after crossing the railway bridge. Continue along this road parallel to the railway for almost a mile. Turn
right into an opening by Rowsley South Junction Signal Box, and cross
the boarded level crossing. Immediately after crossing the line, turn
left along a cinder path running parallel to the line. This leads to the
shed. Walking time 30 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/01/1924 | Change of code to 17D | 01/04/1958 | Change of code to 17C | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 16J |
|
|
|