Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3679 Today
» 4968 Yesterday
» 13973 Week
» 149378 Month
» 609319 Year
» 5048756 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Rugby
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Rugby |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 8 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W8 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 2A | 01/01/1923 | 08/09/1963 | 1F | 09/09/1963 | 31/12/1968 |
|
Date Closed |
31/12/1968 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the east side of Rugby L.M.S. Station. The yard is
partially visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station, and left again under the railway bridge.
There is a gate in a wooden fence on the right hand side. just past the
bridge. A wooden ramp leads from this gate to the shed. Walking time
less than 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 2A | 09/09/1963 | Change of code to 1F | 24/05/1965 | Closed to steam locomotives | 31/12/1968 | Depot closed |
|
|
|