Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 7682 Today
» 7473 Yesterday
» 31022 Week
» 124256 Month
» 584197 Year
» 5023634 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Scarborough
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Scarborough |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SCA | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 50E | 01/02/1950 | 31/03/1963 |
|
Date Closed |
20/05/1963 |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Malton line south of the station.
The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside Scarborough Central Station along Westborough,
and continue into Falsgrave Road. Bear left at the island into Seamer
Road, and the shed entrance is on the left hand side. Walking time 15
minutes.
Note: The shed consists of two separate buildings.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to SCA | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 50E | 20/05/1963 | Depot closed |
|
|
|