Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 614 Today
» 5387 Yesterday
» 29191 Week
» 89485 Month
» 549426 Year
» 4988863 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Southampton Docks
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Southampton Docks |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SOT | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 71I | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 70I | 01/09/1963 | 31/01/1966 |
|
Date Closed |
01/1966 |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in Southampton Dockland.
Turn sharp left outside Southampton Terminus Station into Canute
Road. Enter the Docks by No. 7 Gate, a few yards further on the
right hand side. Continue straight ahead along the dock road until a
number of lines cross this road. Follow these to the left to the shed.
Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to SOT | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 71I | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 70I | 01/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|